Global Patent Index - EP 1010947 A2

EP 1010947 A2 2000-06-21 - A gas turbine with a catalytic combustor and method of operating such a gas turbine

Title (en)

A gas turbine with a catalytic combustor and method of operating such a gas turbine

Title (de)

Gasturbine mit einer katalytischen Brennkammer und Methode zu derem Betrieb

Title (fr)

Turbine à gaz avec chambre de combustion catalytique et sa méthode d'operation

Publication

EP 1010947 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99124944 A

Priority

US 21114798 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is a method and apparatus for operating a gas turbine that includes a catalytic combustor. The catalyst in the catalytic combustor is electrically heated, thereby initiating catalytic combustion without preheating the intake air. Eliminating the need to preheat the intake air allows removal of the preburner which otherwise produces an undesirable amount of oxides of nitrogen NOx, especially at start up and low load conditions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/40; F02C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010947 A2 20000621; EP 1010947 A3 20020320

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 23R 3/40 A, 7F 02C 3/04 B, 7F 02C 3/00 B

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI