Global Patent Index - EP 1010948 A1

EP 1010948 A1 2000-06-21 - Cooking apparatus

Title (en)

Cooking apparatus

Title (de)

Kochgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de cuisson

Publication

EP 1010948 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122367 A

Priority

  • DE 19858019 A
  • DE 19905670 A

Abstract (en)

The ceramic hob (1) has a saucepan support (5) with feet (5b) and carrier surface for a saucepan (6). It also has fixed foot holders (7) for the saucepan support. The holders are formed by countersunk apertures in the hob, which are adapted to the shape of foot ends. Alternatively, the foot holders may be separate one-piece parts fastened to the hob.

Abstract (de)

Bei Kochgeräten mit einer Glaskeramikplatte (1), das mindestens eine Kochstelle mit einem Gasbrenner (3) mit offener Flamme (3 a) aufweist, ist es notwendig, zentriert zu dem Gasbrenner Topfträger (5) zum Aufstellen des jeweiligen Kochgeschirres (6) in einer mechanisch fixierten Position vorzusehen. Die bekannten Ausführungen der fixierten Positionierung der Topfträger sind aufwendig und schwer zu reinigen. Die Erfindung vermeidet diese Nachteile dadurch, daß die Glaskeramikplatte (1) ortsfest ausgebildete Fußhalterungen (7) für die Füße (5 b) des Topfträgers (5) aufweist. Diese Fußhalterungen können durch abgesenkte Ausformungen oder durch Aufwölbungen gebildet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/02 (2006.01); F24C 3/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/085 (2013.01); F24C 15/107 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010948 A1 20000621; EP 1010948 B1 20030521; DE 19905670 A1 20000907; JP 2000179857 A 20000627; JP 4195762 B2 20081210; PL 337153 A1 20000619; US 6279567 B1 20010828; US 6470879 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-01-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1010948E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905635

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-04-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020313

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI