Global Patent Index - EP 1010950 A1

EP 1010950 A1 2000-06-21 - Device for fixing a heating radiator

Title (en)

Device for fixing a heating radiator

Title (de)

Befestigungselement für Heizkörper

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour radiateur de chauffage

Publication

EP 1010950 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203468 A

Priority

NL 1010619 A

Abstract (en)

A device for fixing a heating radiator on a bearing structure, for instance a wall, which device comprises: support means for fixing to the bearing structure in order to support the radiator; fixation means for fixing the position of the radiator in the supported state of this radiator. The device comprises the characteristic that at least the fixation means comprise at least one attachment zone which is adapted for attachment of the radiator to the fixation means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/023 (2013.01); F24D 19/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0216 (2013.01); F24D 19/0243 (2013.01); F24D 19/0283 (2013.01); F24D 19/0286 (2013.01); F24D 19/0289 (2013.01); F24D 2220/2054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010950 A1 20000621; NL 1010619 C2 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040615

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRUGMAN INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI