Global Patent Index - EP 1010951 A3

EP 1010951 A3 2002-09-04 - Method and device for dust removal in rooms with high level of dust

Title (en)

Method and device for dust removal in rooms with high level of dust

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entstaubung von Räumen mit hoher Staubbelastung

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de dépoussiérage pour des locaux à grande quantité de poussière

Publication

EP 1010951 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124256 A

Priority

DE 19858883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010951A2] The method involves dividing the used air outlet vol. flow into two or more sub-vol. flows, whereby at least one sub-flow is fed into the circuit as a circulating flow after dust separation and at least one sub-flow is output directly or indirectly to the atmosphere as used air after dust separation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/1607 (2013.01); Y10S 55/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010951 A2 20000621; EP 1010951 A3 20020904; DE 19858883 A1 20000629; DE 19858883 C2 20010201; US 6299667 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI