Global patent index - EP 1010956 A1

EP 1010956 A1 2000-06-21 - A condenser for a refrigerator, a freezer, a combination thereof, or the like

Title (en)

A condenser for a refrigerator, a freezer, a combination thereof, or the like

Title (de)

Verflüssiger für Kühlschrank, Gefrierschrank, oder deren Kombination

Title (fr)

Condenseur pour réfrigérateur, congélateur, ou leur combinaision

Publication

EP 1010956 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203075 A

Priority

IT MI982691 A

Abstract (en)

A condenser (1) for a refrigerator, a freezer, a combination thereof, or the like, which has long working life and which can be produced with tooling of limited complexity, comprises a coil (5) for a refrigerant fluid and a casing (6) for a substance with a high heat capacity; the casing contains the coil (5) and is produced in a single piece by blowing of plastics material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/04; F28D 7/02; F28D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 23/00 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 7/02 (2006.01); F28D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F25B 23/006 (2013.01); F28D 7/024 (2013.01); F28D 15/00 (2013.01); F25B 2339/046 (2013.01); F25B 2339/047 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010956 A1 20000621; IT 1305868 B1 20010521; IT MI982691 A1 20000615; PL 191086 B1 20060331; PL 337176 A1 20000619; TR 9902504 A2 20000721; TR 9902504 A3 20000721

INPADOC legal status

2014-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140401

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020415

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT ITALIA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020415

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI