Global patent index - EP 1010958 A1

EP 1010958 A1 2000-06-21 - Refrigeration apparatus

Title (en)

Refrigeration apparatus

Title (de)

Kältegerät

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 1010958 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124024 A

Priority

DE 19857846 A

Abstract (en)

The refrigeration unit has at least one freezer compartment (16) closable by a door, cooled by evaporator levels (19,20) at intervals one above the other and contg. at least one frozen goods container. A melt water collection pan (27) is arranged in the freezer compartment below the lowest evaporator level with a collection surface (28) for water dripping from the evaporator planes at the point farthest from the door. The water passes to a collection container via at least one outlet opening.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kältegerät (10), wie einem Gefrierschrank (10), einer Kühl- und Gefrierkombination oder dergleichen, mit wenigstens einem von einer Tür (15) verschließbaren Gefrierraum (16), welcher mit in Abständen übereinander angeordneten Verdampferebenen (18,19,20) gekühlt ist und welche zumindest mit einem Gefriergutbehälter (21) zur Aufnahme von Gefriergut ausgestattet ist, ist unterhalb der im Gefrierraum (16) am tiefsten angeordneten Verdampferebene (20) eine Tauwasserauffangschale (27,57) angeordnet, welche zumindest eine zum Auffangen des im türfernen Bereich von den Verdampferebenen (18,19,20) abtropfenden Schmelzwassers aufzufangen vermögende Auffangfläche (28,64) aufweist und welche wenigstens mit einer Abflußöffnung (32,69) ausgestattet ist, über welche das Schmelzwasser einem innerhalb des Gefrierraumes (16) angeordneten Sammelbehältnis (21,51) zugeführt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/14 (2013.01); F25D 2321/1441 (2013.01); F25D 2321/146 (2013.01); F25D 2400/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010958 A1 20000621; EP 1010958 B1 20030611; DE 19857846 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-12-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905921

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20001124

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI