Global Patent Index - EP 1010958 B1

EP 1010958 B1 2003-06-11 - Refrigeration apparatus

Title (en)

Refrigeration apparatus

Title (de)

Kältegerät

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 1010958 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124024 A

Priority

DE 19857846 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010958A1] The refrigeration unit has at least one freezer compartment (16) closable by a door, cooled by evaporator levels (19,20) at intervals one above the other and contg. at least one frozen goods container. A melt water collection pan (27) is arranged in the freezer compartment below the lowest evaporator level with a collection surface (28) for water dripping from the evaporator planes at the point farthest from the door. The water passes to a collection container via at least one outlet opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/14 (2013.01); F25D 2321/1441 (2013.01); F25D 2321/146 (2013.01); F25D 2400/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010958 A1 20000621; EP 1010958 B1 20030611; DE 19857846 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-12-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905921 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001124

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI