Global patent index - EP 1010962 A2

EP 1010962 A2 2000-06-21 - Water/air cooler

Title (en)

Water/air cooler

Title (de)

Wasser/Luft-Kühler

Title (fr)

Refroidisseur air/eau

Publication

EP 1010962 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123054 A

Priority

DE 29822378 U

Abstract (en)

One water box has screw fastenings to U-shaped side parts while the other has pins (15) on the transverse wall at opposite ends, which point in the direction of the radiator tubes. U-shaped side parts (6) have a web part (17), between brackets (10) of the side parts, bent towards the transverse wall, containing openings to receive the pins. Brackets (22) grip behind lugs (23) on the water box.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wasser/Luft-Kühler für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen, insbesondere für Nutzfahrzeuge, bestehend aus einem Kühlnetz (3), mit Flachrohren und dazwischen angeordneten Lamellen und aus gegenüberliegenden Kunststoffwasserkästen (1,2) mit zwei parallelen Längswänden, einer die Längswände verbindenden Querwand und zwei gegenüberliegenden Stirnwänden; einer der Kunststoffwasserkästen (2) weist an den Enden glattwandige Bohrungen (12) auf, die zur Verbindung u-förmiger Seitenteile (6,7) mit diesem Wasserkasten mittels gewindeschneidender Schrauben (9) dienen, die durch Löcher in den Laschen der Seitenteile (6,7) hindurchgesteckt und in die glattwandigen Bohrungen (12) eingeschraubt sind. Eine vereinfachte Verbindung der Seitenteile mit den Kunststoffwasserkästen, die auch die Längenausdehnung des Kühlnetzes gestattet wird dadurch erreicht, daß der andere Kunststoffwasserkasten (1) an seinen gegenüberliegenden Enden an der Querwand (16) Zapfen (15) besitzt, die in Richtung der Flachrohre wegweisen und daß die u-förmigen Seitenteile (6,7) an den den Löchern (11) gegenüberliegenden Enden einen zwischen den Laschen (10) abgekanteten Stegteil aufweisen, in dem Öffnungen (19) zur gleitenden Aufnahme der Zapfen (15) eingearbeitet sind und daß die Laschen (10) Rastelemente (22) besitzen, die dazu geeignet sind, hinter Anschläge (23) am Kunststoffwasserkasten (1) zu greifen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/001 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822378 U1 19990225; EP 1010962 A2 20000621; EP 1010962 A3 20000712; EP 1010962 B1 20020612; ES 2179586 T3 20030116

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091121

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-04-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110405

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2179586

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901712

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI