Global Patent Index - EP 1011019 A1

EP 1011019 A1 2000-06-21 - Imaging elements comprising transparent electrically conductive layers

Title (en)

Imaging elements comprising transparent electrically conductive layers

Title (de)

Bildaufzeichnungs- und -wiedergabeelemente mit transparenten elektrisch leitenden Schichten

Title (fr)

Eléments d'imagerie comprenant des couches électroconductives transparentes

Publication

EP 1011019 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99204135 A

Priority

US 21636998 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is an imaging element which includes a support, an image-forming layer superposed on the support and an electrically-conductive layer superposed on the support. The electrically-conductive layer includes an electrically-conductive particle having an average particle size less than 0.1 micrometer and a binder, said binder comprising at least 25 weight percent of a polyesterionomer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/85; B41M 5/40; G03F 7/09; G03G 5/05; G03G 5/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); G03C 1/85 (2006.01); G03G 5/14 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/42 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01); G03C 1/89 (2006.01); G03F 7/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/85 (2013.01); B41M 5/426 (2013.01); B41M 5/44 (2013.01); B41M 2205/04 (2013.01); G03C 1/853 (2013.01); G03C 1/89 (2013.01); G03F 7/09 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/89 + G03C 1/7954
  2. G03C 1/853 + G03C 2001/03594

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011019 A1 20000621; JP 2000231178 A 20000822; US 6168911 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050118

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI