Global patent index - EP 1011033 A2

EP 1011033 A2 2000-06-21 - Carrier, toner and electrophotographic photoreceptor comprising a carbosiloxane dendrimer-functional vinyl type polymer

Title (en)

Carrier, toner and electrophotographic photoreceptor comprising a carbosiloxane dendrimer-functional vinyl type polymer

Title (de)

Trägerteilchen, Toner und elektrophotographischer Photorezeptor, die ein Carbosiloxan-Dendrimer funktionelles Vinylpolymer enthalten

Title (fr)

Particules de support pour toner, toner et photorécepteur électrophotographique, contenant un polymère vinylique à fonction dendrimère à base de carbosiloxane

Publication

EP 1011033 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123672 A

Priority

  • JP 35554298 A
  • JP 35554498 A
  • JP 36322098 A

Abstract (en)

A carrier for developing electrostatic latent images has an excellent charging stability, resistance to spenting, and durability and can provide high resolution images over long periods of operation. The carrier achieves these advantageous effects because it contains a pendant carbosiloxane dendrimer-functional vinyl-type polymer. A toner for developing electrostatic images also contains the pendant carbosiloxane dendrimer-functional vinyl-type polymer. The toner has an excellent fluidity, releasability, fixing behavior, resistance to offset, and flexibility and can provide high resolution images. The toner and carrier can be used in various imaging technologies, e.g., electrophotographic technologies, electrostatic recording technologies, and electrostatic printing technologies. An electrophotographic photoreceptor contains, in at least its surface layer, a binder resin and the pendant carbosiloxane dendrimer-functional vinyl-type polymer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/113

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/087 (2006.01); G03G 9/113 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/1136 (2013.01); G03G 9/08773 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011033 A2 20000621; EP 1011033 A3 20000816; CA 2291280 A1 20000530

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030603

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI