Global Patent Index - EP 1011039 A1

EP 1011039 A1 2000-06-21 - GAP-COUPLING BUS SYSTEM

Title (en)

GAP-COUPLING BUS SYSTEM

Title (de)

LÜCKENÜBERBRÜCKUNGS-BUSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME A BUS DE COUPLAGE A DISCONTINUITE

Publication

EP 1011039 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97909668 A

Priority

  • JP 9703922 W
  • JP 28836696 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a gap coupling type bus system, which makes it possible to mutually transfer data between all the modules connected to the bus. The gap coupling type bus system comprises for at least three modules, each module being provided with at least one sending/receiving circuit for sending and receiving a signal: at least three signal lines (21-26) respectively connected to the at least three modules (11-16); and terminating resistors (31-36) connected to respective signal lines at the other ends of the signal lines, each terminating resistor having generally same value as characteristic impedance of the signal line. Those at least three signal lines (21-26) have portions (1-2, 1-3, 2-3, ...) laid in parallel with one another with a predetermined gap, correspondingly to every combination of different two modules out of those at least three modules (11-16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/02; G06F 3/00; H05K 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/40 (2006.01); H05K 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/4072 (2013.01); H05K 1/0228 (2013.01); H05K 1/023 (2013.01); H05K 1/0245 (2013.01); H05K 2201/09263 (2013.01); H05K 2201/097 (2013.01); H05K 2201/10022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011039 A1 20000621; EP 1011039 A4 20010822; EP 1011039 B1 20060301; DE 69735350 D1 20060427; DE 69735350 T2 20060803; JP 3442237 B2 20030902; JP H10133794 A 19980522; US 6600790 B1 20030729; WO 9819225 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071206

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69735350 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990521

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB