Global patent index - EP 1011085 A2

EP 1011085 A2 2000-06-21 - Vehicle allocation method

Title (en)

Vehicle allocation method

Title (de)

Fahrzeugzuteilungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'allocation de véhicules

Publication

EP 1011085 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250392 A

Priority

DE 19857771 A

Abstract (en)

A terminal (1) at a central office polls a vehicle-side terminal (3). The position (PA) of the polling terminal (1) is determined. The position (PF) of a vehicle-side terminal that is known to the central office is transmitted to the polling terminal (1). The polling terminal polls terminals in a predetermined region surrounding the position of the polling terminal. Additional information relating to the vehicle status is transmitted by a polled terminal. This information includes whether the vehicle is already reserved, filled up with fuel, or how long a driver/passenger should have a break. The polling terminal may be a mobile telephone, communicator or smart phone. SMS messages may be transmitted.

Abstract (de)

Eine einfache, kostengünstige und effiziente Erfassung von in der Nähe eines anfragenden Endgerätes 1 befindlichen reservierbaren Endgeräten 3 über eine Zentrale 4 wird ermöglicht durch ein Endgerät 1 und ein Verfahren zur Information eines bei einer Zentrale (4) nach mindestens einem fahrzeugseitigen Endgerät (3) anfragenden Endgerätes (1), wobei die Position des anfragenden Endgerätes (1) bestimmt wird (PA), wobei die Position mindestens eines der Zentrale (4) bekannten, in einem Fahrzeug befindlichen Endgerätes (3) an das anfragende Endgerät (1) übermittelt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/00 (2011.01); G08G 1/123 (2006.01); H04Q 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/202 (2013.01); G07B 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857771 A1 20000615; EP 1011085 A2 20000621; EP 1011085 A3 20010418; EP 1011085 B1 20030212

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-11-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-02-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-11-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-09-03 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904269

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI