Global Patent Index - EP 1011085 A3

EP 1011085 A3 2001-04-18 - Vehicle allocation method

Title (en)

Vehicle allocation method

Title (de)

Fahrzeugzuteilungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'allocation de véhicules

Publication

EP 1011085 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250392 A

Priority

DE 19857771 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1011085A2] A terminal (1) at a central office polls a vehicle-side terminal (3). The position (PA) of the polling terminal (1) is determined. The position (PF) of a vehicle-side terminal that is known to the central office is transmitted to the polling terminal (1). The polling terminal polls terminals in a predetermined region surrounding the position of the polling terminal. Additional information relating to the vehicle status is transmitted by a polled terminal. This information includes whether the vehicle is already reserved, filled up with fuel, or how long a driver/passenger should have a break. The polling terminal may be a mobile telephone, communicator or smart phone. SMS messages may be transmitted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/00 (2011.01); G08G 1/123 (2006.01); H04Q 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/202 (2013.01); G07B 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857771 A1 20000615; EP 1011085 A2 20000621; EP 1011085 A3 20010418; EP 1011085 B1 20030212

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-11-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-02-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-11-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-09-03 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904269 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE AG

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI