Global Patent Index - EP 1011108 A1

EP 1011108 A1 2000-06-21 - Device for making cables with alternating twist direction

Title (en)

Device for making cables with alternating twist direction

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verseilen von Kabeln mit wechselnder Schlagrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de câblage à sens alterné

Publication

EP 1011108 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123749 A

Priority

EP 98123749 A

Abstract (en)

Individual strands (1',1''') are guided through an oscillating twisting head over several roller pairs (2',3'), preferably to form a gently curving arc of radius (R). The roller pairs are mounted so that they rotate about the central axis but can also tilt about the center of each strand to a limited extent in either direction.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Kabelverseilung mit wechselnder Schlagrichtung aus sektorförmigen isolierten elektrischen Leitern (1). Um Beschädigungen an den Leiterisolierungen durch hohe Verseilkräfte zu vermeiden, sind im Verseilkopf (6) und in der Einlaufführung (15) zum Drallspeicher mehrere formschlüssige Führungsrollensätze (2,3) vorgesehen, welche zueinander Freiwinkel zulassen und zwar um die gemeinsame zentrale Achse aller Verseilelemente (1) und/oder um die Achse jedes einzelnen Verseilelementes (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 13/02; D07B 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 5/10 (2006.01); H01B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 7/025 (2013.01); D07B 3/005 (2013.01); H01B 13/0235 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1088 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2002 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011108 A1 20000621; EP 1011108 B1 20040428; AT 265735 T 20040515; DE 59811295 D1 20040603; DK 1011108 T3 20040726; ES 2217487 T3 20041101; PT 1011108 E 20040930; SI 1011108 T1 20041231

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040428

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROSENDAHL MASCHINEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051231

2007-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051215

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-10-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051214

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-06-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-01-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-02-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-20 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20041220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-08 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217487 T3

2004-10-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-08-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-06-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401628

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811295 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENDAHL MASCHINEN GMBH

2004-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEIBERT, GERHARD

2001-03-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2001-02-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001219

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI