Global Patent Index - EP 1011115 A1

EP 1011115 A1 2000-06-21 - Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (en)

Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Chip-Induktivität

Title (fr)

Inductance de puce multicouche

Publication

EP 1011115 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121874 A

Priority

KR 19980055593 A

Abstract (en)

A multilayer type chip inductor includes a pair of outermost sheets each of which has a terminal pattern and a first via hole for an electrical connection with neighboring patterns and a plurality of intermediate sheets each of which has a conductor pattern, a second via hole for an electrical connection with neighboring patterns, and a first through hole for reducing a dielectric constant of the inductor. The intermediate sheets are stacked between the outermost sheets in such a way that the conductor patterns thereof are electrically connected with each other and simultaneously are electrically connected with the terminal patterns of the outermost sheets through the first and the second via holes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/0013 (2013.01); H01F 27/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 19522043 A1 19961219 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 10 31 October 1996 (1996-10-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011115 A1 20000621; EP 1011115 B1 20040428; DE 69916761 D1 20040603; DE 69916761 T2 20040923; KR 20000040048 A 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916761 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI