Global Patent Index - EP 1011116 A3

EP 1011116 A3 2001-05-09 - Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (en)

Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Chip-Induktivität

Title (fr)

Inductance de puce multicouche

Publication

EP 1011116 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99114704 A

Priority

KR 19980055594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1011116A2] An inventive multilayer type chip inductor includes a pair of outermost sheets having a terminal pattern, respectively, and a plurality of intermediate sheets stacked between the outermost sheets. Each of the intermediate sheets has one turned coil-shaped conductor pattern in an electric contact with the terminal pattern of the outermost sheet. Each of the conductor patterns is spirally and outwardly turned from a central portion of the intermediate sheet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28; H01F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2804 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011116 A2 20000621; EP 1011116 A3 20010509; KR 20000040049 A 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01F 27/28 A, 7H 01F 17/00 B

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI