Global Patent Index - EP 1011121 A1

EP 1011121 A1 2000-06-21 - Gas blast switch

Title (en)

Gas blast switch

Title (de)

Druckgasschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur à gas comprimé

Publication

EP 1011121 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117903 A

Priority

DE 19858793 A

Abstract (en)

Pressurized gas switch (30) comprises: (a) two contact pieces (12,13) joined to one another by a transfer unit; (b) an insulating medium nozzle (24) joined to the contact piece (12); (c) the transfer unit includes a bar (20) which by means of a coupling element (22) is joined to the nozzle (24); and (d) the coupling element consists of a plastic material.

Abstract (de)

Es ist ein Druckgaschalter (30) mit folgenden Merkmalen beschrieben: der Druckgasschalter (30) weist ein erstes und ein zweites Kontaktstück (12, 13) auf, die Kontaktstücke (12, 13) sind über eine Übertragungsvorrichtung miteinander gekoppelt, mit dem ersten Kontaktstück (12) ist eine Isolierstoffdüse (24) verbunden, die Übertragungsvorrichtung weist eine Stange (20) auf, die Stange (20) ist über ein Koppelelement (22) mit der Isolierstoffdüse (24) verbunden, das Koppelelement (22) besteht aus einem Kunststoff. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/90 (2006.01); H01H 33/915 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/901 (2013.01); H01H 2033/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011121 A1 20000621; EP 1011121 B1 20020220; DE 19858793 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900874

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130914

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-09-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH, 60528 FRANKFURT, DE

- Document: DE 59900874

- Effective date: 20130715

2013-09-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900874

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130715

2013-09-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900874

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130715

2013-07-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900874

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121008

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AREVA ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: ALSTOM ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH#LYONER STRASSE 44-48#60528 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- AREVA ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH#LYONER STRASSE 44-48#60528 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2005-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: ALSTOM ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH#LILIENTHALSTRASSE 150#34123 KASSEL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ALSTOM ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH#LYONER STRASSE 44-48#60528 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900874 20020328

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2002-02-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020220

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI