Global Patent Index - EP 1011122 A2

EP 1011122 A2 2000-06-21 - Contact unit for electromagnetic relays

Title (en)

Contact unit for electromagnetic relays

Title (de)

Kontakteinheit für elektromagnetische Relais

Title (fr)

Unité de contact pour relais électromagnétiques

Publication

EP 1011122 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123867 A

Priority

DE 19858755 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19858755C1] A contact unit, comprising an undivided contact spring (10) with a flexible torsion region (19) between its fixed end and its contact points, is new. A contact unit comprises a stationary contact (12) and a contact spring (10) which has two transverse contact points (15,16) on an undivided spring end section and, between its fixed end and the contact points, a flexible region (19) capable of torsion about its longitudinal axis.

Abstract (de)

Zur Erhöhung der Zuverlässigkeit der Kontaktgabe bei Sicherheitsrelais ist eine Kontaktfeder (10) mit zwei Kontaktstücken (15, 16) versehen, die am freien Ende der Kontaktfeder (10) quer zu deren Längsachse angeordnet sind und mit an einem gemeinsamen Festkontakt (12) angeordneten Kontaktstücken (17, 18) zusammenarbeiten. Die Kontaktfeder (10) ist in einem Bereich (19) nicht nur biegsam sondern auch um ihre Längsachse ausreichend torsionsfähig, um zu gewährleisten, daß beide Kontaktpaare schließen. Durch Schrägstellung des die Kontaktstücke (15, 16) tragenden freien Endes der Kontaktfeder (10) gegenüber dem Festkontakt (12) wird ein weiches, prellarmes Schließen der Kontakte und gleichzeitig die Funktion eines Vor- und eines Hauptkontaktes erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/56 (2006.01); H01H 1/26 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01); H01H 50/64 (2006.01); H01H 9/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/548 (2013.01); H01H 1/2075 (2013.01); H01H 1/2083 (2013.01); H01H 9/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858755 C1 20000608; AT 299290 T 20050715; AT 475982 T 20100815; DE 59912238 D1 20050811; DE 59915189 D1 20100909; DK 1011122 T3 20050801; EP 1011122 A2 20000621; EP 1011122 A3 20010425; EP 1011122 B1 20050706; EP 1011122 B8 20050831; EP 1575075 A2 20050914; EP 1575075 A3 20080910; EP 1575075 B1 20100728; ES 2242347 T3 20051101; ES 2347967 T3 20101126; JP 2000182456 A 20000630; JP 4265057 B2 20090520; PT 1011122 E 20050930; PT 1575075 E 20100908; SI 1011122 T1 20051231; SI 1575075 T1 20101130; US 2001054546 A1 20011227; US 6300854 B1 20011009; US 6362710 B2 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20130704

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091202

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-09-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-08-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS EUROPE A.G.

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-06-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 09/2005: CORR.: PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS EUROPE AG.

2005-12-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242347 T3

2005-10-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS EUROPE AG

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050712

2005-08-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050402086

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912238 P 20050811

2005-08-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-08-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS EUROPE AG

2005-08-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-07-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-07-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010517

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI