Global patent index - EP 1011126 A2

EP 1011126 A2 2000-06-21 - Metal halogen lamp

Title (en)

Metal halogen lamp

Title (de)

Metallhalogenidlampe

Title (fr)

Lampe aux halogénures métalliques

Publication

EP 1011126 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124410 A

Priority

DE 19857585 A

Abstract (en)

Mercury-free metal halide lamp has a filling containing hafnium and/or zirconium halide for voltage gradient formation and tungsten cycle promotion. A mercury-free metal halide lamp has a filling comprising a noble gas as buffer gas, a compound (HZH) of a halogen (X) and Hf and/or Zr (HZM) for voltage gradient formation and cycle promotion, a light generating metal halide and a further easily evaporated metal halide as a voltage gradient former, the HZH content being 3 mu mol/cm<3> and the ratio (X + Y)/HZM being 5-15.

Abstract (de)

Eine quecksilberfreie Metallhalogenidlampe mit einer Lichtausbeute von mindestens 70 lm/W und einem Farbwiedergabeindex von mindestens 80, besitzt ein keramisches Entladungsgefäß, in das Elektroden vakuumdicht eingeführt sind. Die Füllung umfaßt folgende Komponenten: ein Edelgas, das als Puffergas wirkt, eine Verbindung eines Halogens X mit zumindest einem der Metalle Hafnium und/oder Zirkon (im folgenden als Metallhalogenid HZM bezeichnet), wobei dieses Halogenid im folgenden zusammenfassend als HZH bezeichnet wird, wobei HZH gleichzeitig Aufgaben der Spannungsgradientenbildung und der Förderung des Kreisprozesses wahrnimmt, ein Lichterzeuger, bestehend zumindest aus einem weiteren Metallhalogenid, mindestens ein weiteres Metallhalogenid MYn, das leicht verdampft und das als Spannungsgradientenbildner verwendet wird, wobei der spezifische Mol-Gehalt der HZH größer gleich 3 µmol/cm<3> ist. Dabei gilt zusätzlich: 5 <= (X + Y)/HZM <= 15, wodurch die Lebensdauer der Lampe mehr als 5000 Std. beträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12; H01J 61/16; H01J 61/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/125 (2013.01); H01J 61/827 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857585 A1 20000615; CA 2292142 A1 20000614; EP 1011126 A2 20000621; EP 1011126 A3 20060823; HU 222700 B1 20030929; HU 9904194 A2 20000628; HU 9904194 A3 20010730; JP 2000182564 A 20000630; US 6483241 B1 20021119

INPADOC legal status

2010-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100428

2007-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20061010

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI