Global Patent Index - EP 1011166 A1

EP 1011166 A1 2000-06-21 - Microwave coupling element

Title (en)

Microwave coupling element

Title (de)

Mikrowellen-Koppelelement

Title (fr)

Elément de couplage à micro-ondes

Publication

EP 1011166 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119577 A

Priority

DE 19856339 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19856339A1] The microwave coupling element uses 2 galvanically separated striplines (3,3'), extending parallel to one anoher and respectively coupled to an input line (1) and an output line (2) with given line resistances. The stripline width and/or spacing is up to 2 times that required for optimal matching between the input and output lines, the matching error compensated by using at least one transformation line (4,4') with a lesser line resistance than the input and output lines.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mikrowellen-Koppelelement zur Kopplung einer Eingangsleitung (1) mit einer Ausgangsleitung (2), die jeweils einen festgelegten Leitungs-Wellenwiderstand RL haben, weist einen Koppelabschnitt mit einer ersten, mit der Eingangsleitung verbundenen Streifenleitung (3) und einer zweiten, dazu parallelen und von der ersten Streifenleitung (3) galvanisch entkoppelten zweiten Streifenleitung (3'), wobei Leiterbreite und/oder Leiterabstand der Streifenleitungen (3,3') bis zu zweimal so groß sind wie die/der zur Erzielung einer minimalen Fehlanpassung mit der Eingangs- und Ausgangsleitung optimale Leiterbreite beziehungsweise Leiterabstand, und wobei zur Kompensation der daraus resultierenden Fehlanpassung wenigstens eine Transformationsleitung (4,4') vorgesehen ist, deren Wellenwiderstand RT kleiner ist als der Leitungs-Wellenwiderstand RL. Dadurch können bei geringer Einfügungsdämpfung im Vergleich mit herkömmlichen Koppelelementen größere Strukturbreiten der Streifenleitungen des Koppelabschnitts realisiert werden, wodurch die Herstellungskosten gesenkt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/203

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/203 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/20363 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4334202 A 19820608 - CORNISH WILLIAM D, et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 87 (E - 393) 5 April 1986 (1986-04-05)
  • [Y] D LACOMBE ET AL.: "OCTAVE-BAND MICROSTRIP DC BLOCKS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES., vol. 20, no. 8, August 1972 (1972-08-01), IEEE INC. NEW YORK., US, pages 555 - 556, XP002132120, ISSN: 0018-9480
  • [Y] C.E. FREE ET AL.: "EXCESS PHASE IN MICROSTRIP DC BLOCKS", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., vol. 20, no. 21, 11 October 1984 (1984-10-11), IEE STEVENAGE., GB, pages 892 - 893, XP002132121, ISSN: 0013-5194

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19856339 A1 20000608; EP 1011166 A1 20000621; US 6388538 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060804

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050630

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI