Global Patent Index - EP 1011173 A3

EP 1011173 A3 2000-11-08 - Cable connector

Title (en)

Cable connector

Title (de)

Kabelverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour câble

Publication

EP 1011173 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99124728 A

Priority

JP 37590498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1011173A2] Disclosed is a cable connector comprising an insulating housing having two or more parallel-piled, lateral arrangements of terminal cavities, each terminal cavity containing a terminal, which is connected to the core conductor of a selected insulated wire in a wire cable. The terminal has a crimping barrel formed on ist root side for pinching the end of the selected insulated wire, and a hollow socket formed on ist tip end for receiving a selected pin terminal in a counter cable connector. The hollow socket has lances projecting from the opposite side walls and diverging toward the root of the terminal. Each terminal cavity has catch recesses formed on the opposite side walls confronting the opposite lanced-side walls of the terminal when inserted in a selected terminal cavity. The terminals each having the core conductor crimped thereto by the crimping barrel are inserted in the terminal cavities until the lances have been caught by the catch recesses, thereby preventing the pulling-off of the wire cable from the cable connector. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/42; H01R 13/424; H01R 13/432

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/428 (2006.01); H01R 13/432 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/432 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011173 A2 20000621; EP 1011173 A3 20001108; JP 2000182707 A 20000630; KR 200183187 Y1 20000515; TW 433667 U 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/42 A, 7H 01R 13/432 B, 7H 01R 13/424 B

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI