Global patent index - EP 1011174 A2

EP 1011174 A2 2000-06-21 - Sealed plug connector and method of manufacturing

Title (en)

Sealed plug connector and method of manufacturing

Title (de)

Abgedichteter Steckverbinder und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Connecteur à fiche scellé et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1011174 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118408 A

Priority

DE 19858111 A

Abstract (en)

A plug connector has a fluid-tight cured resin sealing layer (16) for embedding contacts (14) and for closing a gap between an insulating body and a metal collar (8). A plug connector has plug and connection portions (1, 2), in the form of flanged metal collars (7, 8) joined together by their flanges, and an insulating body provided in the connection portion collar (8) for fitting individual contacts (14), a gap being formed between the insulating body and the collar (8). A fluid-tight seal is formed by a cured molding resin layer (16) which has a Shore D hardness of 30 and in which the individual contacts (14) are embedded, the outer periphery of the resin layer (16) being flush with that of the connection portion collar (8) for closing the gap. An Independent claim is also included for production of the above plug connector. Preferably the molding resin is cured to a polyurethane material.

Abstract (de)

Ein Steckverbinder weist zur Abdichtung auf dem Isolierkörper (12) des Anschlussbereichs (2) eine Schicht (16) aus ausgehärteten Gießharz auf, deren Außenumfang mit dem Außenumfang des Metallkragens (8) des Anschlussbereichs (2) fluchtet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011174 A2 20000621; EP 1011174 A3 20020130; DE 19858111 A1 20000629; DE 19858111 C2 20020502

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040604

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI