Global Patent Index - EP 1011175 A2

EP 1011175 A2 2000-06-21 - Connector for coaxial cabel having an corrugated outer conductor

Title (en)

Connector for coaxial cabel having an corrugated outer conductor

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für Koaxialkabel mit ringgewelltem Aussenleiter

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour câble coaxial ayant un conducteur extérieur ondulé

Publication

EP 1011175 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120461 A

Priority

DE 19857528 A

Abstract (en)

The connector has a plug head (5) with an opening (51) with an internal thread with an annular surface (52) for contacting the end of the cable's outer conductor and a contact sleeve with radially sprung segments and a hollow bolt (7) with an O-ring (8) that seals the annular gap between the plug head add hollow bolt. The tightening movement of the hollow bolt is divided in two by the sealing O-ring, which is arranged so that it mounts the end of the plug head at the end of a pre-mounting phase. The plug head aperture on the cable side has an unthreaded section with an internal diameter greater than that of the hollow bolt in the threaded section (72).

Abstract (de)

Ein Steckverbinder für ein Koaxialkabel umfaßt einen Steckerkopf (5), der eine Ausnehmung (51) mit Innengewinde hat. In der Ausnehmung (51) befindet sich eine Ringfläche (52) zur Kontaktierung des Kabelaußenleiters, der von einer Kontakthülse (6) umgeben ist, die ihrerseits von einer Hohlschraube (7) umschlossen wird. Die Hohlschraube (7) belastet nach dem Zurücklegen eines Spannweges die Kontakthülse (6) in der Weise, daß der Endbereich des Kabelaußenleiters gegen die Ringfläche (52) geklemmt wird. Der Spannweg der Hohlschraube (7) ist in zwei Abschnitte gegliedert, von denen der erste einem vormontierten und der zweite dem endmontierten Zustand des Steckverbinders auf dem Kabel entsprechen. In einer Ringnut (73) der Hohlschraube (7) ist ein O-Ring (8) angeordnet, der am Ende des ersten Spannwegabschnittes gegen den Stirnrand des Steckerkopfes ansteht und am Ende des zweiten Spannwegabschnittes von dem Steckerkopf übergriffen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646; H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/564 (2013.01); H01R 13/5202 (2013.01); H01R 9/0521 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011175 A2 20000621; EP 1011175 A3 20020612; EP 1011175 B1 20050105; EP 1011175 B2 20130703; BR 9907487 A 20000808; CN 1113445 C 20030702; CN 1257330 A 20000621; DE 19857528 A1 20000817; DE 19857528 C2 20020620; HK 1027675 A1 20050401; US 6217384 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-22 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 59911404

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-07-15 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: AELC

2013-07-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911404

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2006-03-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-01-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SPINNER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SPINNER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-12-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: WILHELM SIHN JR. GMBH & CO. KGWILHELM-SIHN-STR

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-04-01 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1027675

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911404

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040428

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI