Global Patent Index - EP 1011177 A2

EP 1011177 A2 2000-06-21 - Interlocked electrical socket

Title (en)

Interlocked electrical socket

Title (de)

Verriegelte electrische Steckdose

Title (fr)

Prise électrique verrouillé

Publication

EP 1011177 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122372 A

Priority

IT MI982689 A

Abstract (en)

An interlocked electrical socket, characterized in that it comprises, in a single body, a switch means (11), a coupling means (113) adapted to receive a plug (103), and a lock/release means (115) for locking or releasing said switch means and said coupling means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/707

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/707 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/707 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011177 A2 20000621; EP 1011177 A3 20020327; IT 1305867 B1 20010521; IT MI982689 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041123

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040514

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI