Global Patent Index - EP 1011219 A2

EP 1011219 A2 2000-06-21 - Method and means for producing traffic information concerning traffic situations covering a plurality of mutually interconnected segments of a road traffic system

Title (en)

Method and means for producing traffic information concerning traffic situations covering a plurality of mutually interconnected segments of a road traffic system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Erzeugung von Verkehrsinformationen für sich über mehrere verkettete Segmente eines Strassenverkehrsnetzes erstreckenden Zuständen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la génération d'informations routières concernant des situations routières couvrant une pluralité de segments d'un réseau routier

Publication

EP 1011219 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250406 A

Priority

  • DE 19859523 A
  • DE 19948109 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves storing messages (5-7) received in a terminal containing. state information (16) representing the status of segments of a road traffic network and the identity of the segments involved, locating stored messages whose segment numbers are sequential and only combining segments with sequential numbers into traffic information (12) for output to the user. An Independent claim is also included for a terminal, especially for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Eine optimierte Verkehrsinformation eines Endgerätnutzers wird ermöglicht durch ein Endgerät, mit einem Empfänger (2) zum Empfangen von Verkehrsmeldungen (5,6,7), welche den Zustand von Segmenten eines Straßenverkehrsnetzes repräsentierende Zustandsinformationen (16;16,18) und die Identitäten betroffener Segmente (17) repräsentierende Segmentnummern (4711, 4712, 4713) enthalten, mit einem Speicher (4) zum Speichern empfangener Verkehrsmeldungen (5,6,7), mit einer Verkehrsinformations-Generationseinrichtung (8) zum Erstellen von einem Nutzer (13) des Endgerätes (1) ausgebbaren Verkehrsinformationen (12), mit einer Ausgabeeinrichtung (11) zum Ausgeben der erstellten Verkehrsinformationen (12) an den Nutzer (13) des Endgerätes (1), wobei die Verkehrsinformations-Generationseinrichtung (10), eine Sucheinrichtung aufweist zum Suchen von im Speicher (4) gespeicherten Verkehrsmeldungen (5,6,7) mit aufeinanderfolgenden Segmentnummern (4711, 4712, 4713) und eine Verkehrsinformations-Text-Syntheseeinrichtung (10) zum Bilden einer an den Nutzer (13) auszugebenden Verkehrsinformation, basierend auf hinsichtlich ihrer Segmentnumerierung (4711, 4712, 4713) aufeinanderfolgenden Verkehrsmeldungen (16), aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1011219 A2 20000621; EP 1011219 A3 20050126

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-11-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2005-10-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATX EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATX EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI