Global Patent Index - EP 1011330 A4

EP 1011330 A4 2001-05-16 - CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM AXON REGENERATION

Title (en)

CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM AXON REGENERATION

Title (de)

REGENERATION VON AXONEN DES ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

REGENERATION D'AXONES DANS LE SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL

Publication

EP 1011330 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98943195 A

Priority

  • US 9816794 W
  • US 5526897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908533A1] Therapies for the treatment of a variety of central nervous system injuries including acute or chronic spinal cord injury, traumatic brain injury, and white matter stroke involve the administration of rho protein inhibitors to promote axon regeneration. Local administration is employed in typical embodiments, and this may include injection of a recombinant virus that expresses an inhibitor. In one embodiment, the inhibitor is C. botulinium C3 exoenzyme or a chimeric C. botulinum C2/C3 construct expressed in a replication-deficient adeno, adeno-associated, or herpes virus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; A01N 43/04; A61K 38/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/06 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/33 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1077 (2013.01); A61K 38/4893 (2013.01); C07K 14/33 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] K. JALINK, E.J. VAN CORVEN ET AL.: "Inhibition of lysophosphatidate-and thrombin-induced neurite retraction and neuronal cell rounding by ADP ribosylation of the small GTP-binding protein rho", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, vol. 126, no. 3, August 1994 (1994-08-01), pages 801 - 810, XP002915256
  • [Y] MARTIN F.B.G. GEBBINK, ET AL.: "Identification of a novel, putative rho-specific GDP/GTP exchange factor and a rhoA-binding protein: control of neuronal morphology", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, vol. 137, no. 7, 30 July 1997 (1997-07-30), pages 1603 - 1613, XP000984783
  • [Y] P. LAMOUREUX, ET AL.: "Rac is required for growth cone function but not neurite assembly", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, vol. 110, March 1997 (1997-03-01), pages 635 - 641, XP000984782
  • [Y] R. KOZMA, ET AL.: "Rho family GTPases and neuronal growth cone remodelling: Relationship between increased complexity induced by cdc42Hs, Rac1, and acetylcholine and collapse induced by rhoA and lysophosphatidic acid", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 17, no. 3, March 1997 (1997-03-01), pages 1201 - 1211, XP000984781
  • See also references of WO 9908533A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908533 A1 19990225; AU 735607 B2 20010712; AU 9104298 A 19990308; CA 2300878 A1 19990225; EP 1011330 A1 20000628; EP 1011330 A4 20010516; JP 2001515018 A 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040518

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE