Global Patent Index - EP 1011370 A1

EP 1011370 A1 2000-06-28 - HAIRCUTTING GUIDE

Title (en)

HAIRCUTTING GUIDE

Title (de)

HAARSCHNEIDEFÜHRUNGSEINHEIT

Title (fr)

GUIDE COUPE CHEVEUX

Publication

EP 1011370 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98916771 A

Priority

  • CH 9800179 W
  • CH 108197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CH688880A5] The invention concerns a haircutting guide consisting of a flexible strip (6) whereon one surface comprises at least a row of spikes (8 and 9) and another ductile material maintaining the shape. The method consists in placing the guide around the nape of the neck, smoothing the hair over it, maintaining the whole with a rubber band (1) from one guide end to the other, curving the guide along the required cut, sliding the guide up to the required length and cutting along the guide top edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 24/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 24/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 24/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851184A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

CH 688880 A5 19980515; AU 7026398 A 19981208; CN 1262605 A 20000809; DE 69811516 D1 20030327; EP 1011370 A1 20000628; EP 1011370 B1 20030219; WO 9851184 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2005-05-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GUARNACCIA ALEXANDRE

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811516 P 20030327

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL