Global Patent Index - EP 1011376 A1

EP 1011376 A1 2000-06-28 - A GROOMING IMPLEMENT

Title (en)

A GROOMING IMPLEMENT

Title (de)

PFLEGEGERÄT

Title (fr)

ARTICLE POUR SOINS

Publication

EP 1011376 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97954081 A

Priority

  • GB 9626880 A
  • US 9722682 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827846A1] The invention relates to a personal grooming implement, such as a toothbrush (1), comprising a segmented head (2), wherein the segments (6) are essentially connected to each other only by an elastomer (7), the elastomer preferably being fused to the adjacent segments. In a preferred embodiment the implement is a toothbrush having segments (6) disposed longitudinally along the brush head (2), the segments being connected to each other only by an elastomer which is fused to each segment. The strength of adherence of the elastomer to the segments is such that the head can be repeatedly flexed in each direction without loss of structural integrity. In this manner the use of hinges to connect the segments can be avoided, thus improving the reliability and ease of manufacture of the brush and providing greater flexibility in head design.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/04; A46B 5/00; A46B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 7/06 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/0025 (2013.01); A46B 7/06 (2013.01); A46B 9/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827846 A1 19980702; AT 370680 T 20070915; AU 5795298 A 19980717; CA 2274128 A1 19980702; CA 2274128 C 20040323; CN 1127311 C 20031112; CN 1241121 A 20000112; CZ 293400 B6 20040414; CZ 9902301 A3 19991215; DE 69738051 D1 20071004; DE 69738051 T2 20080515; EP 1011376 A1 20000628; EP 1011376 A4 20040728; EP 1011376 B1 20070822; GB 9626880 D0 19970212; HU 0000166 A2 20000528; HU 0000166 A3 20000628; HU 222300 B1 20030628; JP 2001506903 A 20010529; PE 30299 A1 19990410; PL 186825 B1 20040331; PL 334212 A1 20000214; RU 2191532 C2 20021027; SK 83999 A3 20000516; TR 9901449 T2 19990823

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111212

2012-09-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2011-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071122

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080122

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070822

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071123

2008-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070822

2008-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Free text: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY#ONE PROCTER & GAMBLE PLAZA#CINCINNATI, OHIO 45202 (US) -TRANSFER TO- THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY#ONE PROCTER & GAMBLE PLAZA#CINCINNATI, OHIO 45202 (US)

2008-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071203

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070822

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69738051 P 20071004

2007-09-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-09-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2007-08-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-07-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030340

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060123

2004-07-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 46B 9/04 A

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 46B 7/06 B

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 46B 5/00 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990628

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE