Global Patent Index - EP 1011380 A1

EP 1011380 A1 2000-06-28 - KITCHEN ARRANGEMENT WITH A TOP PART AND AT LEAST ONE SUBSTRUCTURE, CARRIAGE FOR REMOVABLY SUSPENDING A SUBSTRUCTURE MODULE FROM THE TOP PART

Title (en)

KITCHEN ARRANGEMENT WITH A TOP PART AND AT LEAST ONE SUBSTRUCTURE, CARRIAGE FOR REMOVABLY SUSPENDING A SUBSTRUCTURE MODULE FROM THE TOP PART

Title (de)

KÜCHENEINRICHTUNG MIT OBERTEIL UND MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM UNTERBAU, UND WAGEN ZUM EIN- UND AUSHÄNGEN EINES UNTERBAU-MODULS AN EINEM OBERTEIL

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE CUISINE AVEC UNE PARTIE SUPERIEURE ET AU MOINS UNE STRUCTURE INFERIEURE, ET CHARIOT POUR ACCROCHER A ET DECROCHER DE LA PARTIE SUPERIEURE UN MODULE FAISANT PARTIE DE LA STRUCTURE INFERIEURE

Publication

EP 1011380 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942700 A

Priority

  • AT 9700217 W
  • AT 65696 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9820776A1] A kitchen arrangement (1), in particular for large-scale catering establishments, has a top part (3) with working units (11 to 15), for example heating surfaces, deep fat fryers, etc., and at least one substructure (23 to 25; 18). The top part (3) is designed as a closed frame (4) substantially free of outside joints, having a central opening (5) in which a corresponding working unit (11 to 15) is removably inserted. Suspension elements are provided at the bottom side of the frame (4) for removably suspending substructure modules (24, 25). Also disclosed is a carriage for removably suspending a substructure module (24) from a top part (3) of such a kitchen arrangement (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 77/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/022 (2013.01); A47B 77/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9820776A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9820776 A1 19980522; AT 1702 U1 19971027; AU 4444697 A 19980603; DE 19781256 D2 20000803; DE 59709934 D1 20030528; EP 1011380 A1 20000628; EP 1011380 B1 20030423; PL 334874 A1 20000327; YU 21699 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-10-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051013

2004-10-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LOHBERGER HEIZ + KOCHGERATE-TECHNOLOGIE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-04-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-07-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SPIERENBURG & PARTNER AG, PATENT- UND MARKENANWAEL

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709934 P 20030528

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GR IT LI NL SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-04-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 19990504

- Countries: SI

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARCHHART, WOLFGANG

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LOHBERGER, HEIZ + KOCHGERAETE-TECHNOLOGIE GMBH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010710

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990504

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GR IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990505