Global Patent Index - EP 1011394 A1

EP 1011394 A1 2000-06-28 - CARTRIDGE FOR CONTAINING FLAT ARTICLES

Title (en)

CARTRIDGE FOR CONTAINING FLAT ARTICLES

Title (de)

KASSETTE ZUR AUFNAHME VON FLACHEN ARTIKELN

Title (fr)

CASSETTE DESTINEE A CONTENIR DES ARTICLES PLATS

Publication

EP 1011394 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97920232 A

Priority

  • US 9705823 W
  • US 62576896 A
  • US 4364697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736523A1] A cartridge (25) for containing mail. The cartridge (25) is specially adapted for use in a method and apparatus for automatically stacking mail into cartridges in output compartments (20) of a sorting machine (15), robotically transferring filled cartridges from the output compartments to a buffer shelf (40); and from the buffer shelf (40) to a docking station (55) of a cartridge unloader and automatic feeder to the input of the sorting machine, and for transferring empty cartridges from the docking station to either the buffer or the output compartments of the sorter (15), is provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/02 (2006.01); B07C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/025 (2013.01); B07C 3/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/422542 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736523 A1 19971009; AU 2447797 A 19971022; CA 2250532 A1 19971009; DE 69730451 D1 20040930; DE 69730451 T2 20050901; EP 1011394 A1 20000628; EP 1011394 A4 20020724; EP 1011394 B1 20040825

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080328

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080328

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730451 P 20040930

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-07-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47F 7/00 A, 7B 07C 3/00 B, 7B 07C 3/06 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981029

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT