Global Patent Index - EP 1011419 A4

EP 1011419 A4 2000-06-28 - INTELLIGENT PROMPTING

Title (en)

INTELLIGENT PROMPTING

Title (de)

INTELLIGENTE BEGLEITUNG

Title (fr)

GUIDAGE INTELLIGENT

Publication

EP 1011419 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97924493 A

Priority

  • US 9702789 W
  • US 60968996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5823949A] A method and apparatus for helping healthcare professionals create clinical protocols or assist in direct entry of medical finding into a chart by intelligently prompting a healthcare professional with medical findings associated with at least one medical finding which has already been entered in the protocol is disclosed. First of all, at least one medical finding for a patient is inputted into the system wherein each finding is assigned a point value for each diagnosis within a knowledge base. A total number of points for each diagnosis is then totalled for all of the findings which have been entered into the system. The possible diagnoses are then ranked in descending point total and a predetermined plurality of the highest ranked diagnoses are selected. Once the highest ranked diagnoses have been selected, the healthcare professional is prompted with additional findings associated with the selected diagnoses which have not yet been inputted into the clinical protocol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/00 (2006.01); G06F 19/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/3406 (2013.01); A61B 5/00 (2013.01); G06F 19/325 (2013.01); Y10S 128/924 (2013.01); Y10S 706/924 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0531889 A2 19930317 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]
  • [A] US 5265010 A 19931123 - EVANS-PAGANELLI BARBARA [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9400817 A1 19940106 - HEALTH RISK MANAGEMENT INC [US]
  • [A] WO 9524010 A1 19950908 - MEDICAL DIMENSIONS INC [US]
  • [A] US 5463548 A 19951031 - ASADA NAOKI [US], et al
  • [A] MASAHIKO OKADA ET AL: "KNOWLEDGE REPRESENTATION AND COMPILATION FOR SYMPTOM-DISEASE-TEST RELATIONSHIPS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 36, no. 5, 1 May 1989 (1989-05-01), pages 547 - 551, XP000186098, ISSN: 0018-9294
  • [A] TANDY HERREN L ET AL: "THE ROLE OF INTELLIGENT PLANNING AND SCHEDULING IN THE DIAGNOSTIC PROCESS", MEDICAL INFORMATICS, ETHICS, CARDIOLOGY, INSTRUMENTATION, SAN DIEGO, OCT. 28 - 31, 1993, vol. 2, no. CONF. 15, 28 October 1993 (1993-10-28), SZETO A;RANGARAJ M RANGAYYAN, pages 640/641, XP000436875
  • [A] TIMPKA T: "A HYPERTEXT KNOWLEDGE BASE FOR PRIMARY CARE - LIMEDS IN LINCKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL. (SIGIR), CAMBRIDGE, MA., JUNE 25 - 28, 1989, no. CONF. 12, 25 June 1989 (1989-06-25), BELKIN N J;VAN RIJSBERGEN C J, pages 221 - 228, XP000239151
  • [A] BASSOE C -F: "AUTOMATED DIAGNOSES FROM CLINICAL NARRATIVES: A MEDICAL SYSTEM BASED ON COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL RECORDS, NATURAL LANGUAGE PROCESSING,AND NEURAL NETWORK TECHNOLOGY", NEURAL NETWORKS, vol. 8, no. 2, 1 January 1995 (1995-01-01), pages 313 - 319, XP000497809, ISSN: 0893-6080
  • See also references of WO 9731567A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5823949 A 19981020; AT 217105 T 20020515; CA 2247918 A1 19970904; CA 2247918 C 20021224; DE 69712371 D1 20020606; DE 69712371 T2 20020822; EP 1011419 A1 20000628; EP 1011419 A4 20000628; EP 1011419 B1 20020502; WO 9731567 A1 19970904

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170224

2017-03-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170224

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69712371 20020606

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-05-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217105 T 20020515

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDICOMP SYSTEMS, INC.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 19/00 A, 7A 61B 5/00 B

2000-12-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS TO ASSIST A USER IN CREATING A MEDICAL PROTOCOL

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 5/00 A, 7G 06F 19/00 B

2000-12-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS TO ASSIST AN USER TO CREATE A MEDICAL PROTOCOL

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980917

2000-06-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991112

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE