Global Patent Index - EP 1011519 A1

EP 1011519 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD FOR USING TROPOELASTIN AND FOR PRODUCING TROPOELASTIN BIOMATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR USING TROPOELASTIN AND FOR PRODUCING TROPOELASTIN BIOMATERIALS

Title (de)

METHODE ZUM GEBRAUCH VON TROPOELASTIN UND ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIOMATERIALIEN AUFDER BASIS VON TROPOELASTIN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR UTILISER LA TROPOELASTINE ET POUR PRODUIRE DES BIOMATERIAUX A BASE DE TROPOELASTINE

Publication

EP 1011519 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98904955 A

Priority

  • US 9802244 W
  • US 79777097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834563A1] It is a general object of the invention to provide a method of effecting repair or replacement or supporting a section of a body tissue using tropoelastin, preferably cross-linked tropoelastin and specifically to provide a tropoelastin biomaterial suitable for use as a stent, for example, a vascular stent, or as conduit replacement, as an artery, vein or a ureter replacement. The tropoelastin biomaterial itself can also be used as a stent or conduit covering or coating or lining.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/06 (2013.01); A61L 27/22 (2006.01); A61L 27/36 (2006.01); A61L 27/38 (2006.01); A61L 31/00 (2006.01); A61L 31/04 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/82 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/3839 (2013.01); A61F 2/06 (2013.01); A61L 27/227 (2013.01); A61L 27/3683 (2013.01); A61L 27/3804 (2013.01); A61L 31/005 (2013.01); A61L 31/047 (2013.01); A61F 2/0077 (2013.01); A61F 2/82 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61L 27/227 + A61L 27/54 + A61L 27/50 + A61L 27/36
  2. A61L 31/047 + A61L 31/16 + A61L 31/14 + A61L 31/005

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834563 A1 19980813; AU 6270098 A 19980826; AU 737125 B2 20010809; CA 2279902 A1 19980813; CA 2279902 C 20090113; EP 1011519 A1 20000628; EP 1011519 A4 20060927

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140218

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070123

2006-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060829

2006-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61L 27/00 20060101AFI20060823BHEP

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-OREGON

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GREGORY, KENTON W.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE