Global patent index - EP 1011530 A1

EP 1011530 A1 2000-06-28 - INTRAVASCULAR STENT

Title (en)

INTRAVASCULAR STENT

Title (de)

INTRAVASKULARER STENT

Title (fr)

EXTENSEUR INTRAVASCULAIRE

Publication

EP 1011530 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912031 A

Priority

  • US 9805856 W
  • US 82486597 A
  • US 82414297 A
  • US 82486697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842277A1] A stent in a non-expanded state has a first column expansion strut pair. A plurality of the first column expansion strut pair form a first expansion column. A plurality of second column expansion strut pair form a second expansion column. A plurality of first serial connecting struts form a first connecting strut column that couples the first expansion column to the second expansion column. The first expansion column, the second expansion column, and the first connecting strut column form a plurality of geometric cells. At least a portion of the plurality are asymmetrical geometric cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/06 (2006.01); A61F 2/84 (2006.01); A61F 2/90 (2006.01); A61F 2/91 (2013.01); A61F 2/915 (2013.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/82 (2006.01); A61F 2/958 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/91 (2013.01); A61F 2/915 (2013.01); A61F 2/958 (2013.01); A61F 2002/91525 (2013.01); A61F 2002/91533 (2013.01); A61F 2002/91558 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0013 (2013.01); A61F 2250/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842278A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842277 A1 19981001; AU 6583998 A 19981020; AU 6584498 A 19981020; EP 0971644 A1 20000119; EP 1011530 A1 20000628; JP 2002515810 A 20020528; JP 2002523009 A 20020723; JP 2007216042 A 20070830; JP 4015204 B2 20071128; JP 4046773 B2 20080213; JP 4885041 B2 20120229; WO 9842278 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC.

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL