Global Patent Index - EP 1011544 A1

EP 1011544 A1 2000-06-28 - METACARPAL-PHALANGEAL JOINT REPLACEMENT

Title (en)

METACARPAL-PHALANGEAL JOINT REPLACEMENT

Title (de)

METAKARPOPHALANGISCHER GELENKERSATZ

Title (fr)

ARTICULATION METARCAPO-PHALANGIENNE DE REMPLACEMENT

Publication

EP 1011544 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97948149 A

Priority

  • US 9719894 W
  • US 74371796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819637A1] A joint prosthesis for replacement of the metacarpal-phalangeal (MP) joint (19) of a human finger which includes a metacarpal element (13) with a stem (15) for reception into the medullary cavity of the metacarpal bone (11) and a generally ball-shaped articular head (17) and a phalangeal element (14) with a stem (16) for reception into the medullary cavity of the proximal phalangeal bone (12) and a generally socket-shaped head (18) which conforms to the ball-shaped head (17). The metacarpal element's (13) articular head (17) has reliefs (51, 52) located on each of its two lateral sides so as to provide a generally free path for the collateral ligaments (43, 44). The phalangeal element's (14) articular head (18) has a dorsal protrusion (71) that resists subluxation-dislocation of the phalangeal bone and grooves (31, 32) in its concave surface (22) which allow biological fluids access to the inner regions of the articulation contact surfaces (21, 22). The proximal face of the head (18) may be tangent to a plane (P), or the face of the head (118) may be tangent to a cylinder of circular cross section to provide greater capture and joint stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/42 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/30 (2006.01); A61F 2/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/4241 (2013.01); A61F 2/30767 (2013.01); A61F 2/30965 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30125 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30158 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30616 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30649 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30652 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30673 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30688 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30706 (2013.01); A61F 2002/3082 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30934 (2013.01); A61F 2002/4251 (2013.01); A61F 2002/4631 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0008 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0026 (2013.01); A61F 2250/0082 (2013.01); A61F 2310/00173 (2013.01); A61F 2310/00574 (2013.01); A61F 2310/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9819637A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819637 A1 19980514; AT 288722 T 20050215; CA 2269942 A1 19980514; CA 2269942 C 20070403; DE 69732500 D1 20050317; DE 69732500 T2 20060427; EP 1011544 A1 20000628; EP 1011544 B1 20050209; ES 2237805 T3 20050801; JP 2001504009 A 20010327; JP 4014644 B2 20071128; US 5782927 A 19980721; US 6159247 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171102

2017-11-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171102

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69732500

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071103

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ASCENSION ORTHOPEDICS INC.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2006-11-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051201

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051107

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-03 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20051103

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237805 T3

2005-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69732500 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990526

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE