Global Patent Index - EP 1011563 A1

EP 1011563 A1 2000-06-28 - DUAL MODE OPHTHALMIC LASER ABLATION

Title (en)

DUAL MODE OPHTHALMIC LASER ABLATION

Title (de)

DUAL-MODE OPHTHALMISCHE LASERABLATION

Title (fr)

ABLATION LASER OPHTALMIQUE A DOUBLE MODE

Publication

EP 1011563 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922772 A

Priority

  • EP 9802428 W
  • US 4490897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848746A1] A dual mode excimer laser eye surgery system is provided. The eye is first treated for primary corneal defects using a large, fixed spot size, and remaining irregularities are removed using a small fixed spot size. The large size allows for faster treatment, and the small size provided for more precision in the treatment of irregular topographies. The system is preferably implemented in a distributed topography environment. For example, a treatment pattern using a large, fixed spot size is provided to doctors based on visual acuity data, such as the degree of dioptric correction needed. The effect of this treatment is then overlaid on a computer against the patient's actual eye topography. The small fixed spot size is used to remove any remaining irregularities yielding a preferred treatment pattern. This combined treatment pattern is then distributed to an excimer laser eye surgery system that performs the large spot size ablation and then the small spot size ablation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 9/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61F 9/01 (2006.01); A61B 17/30 (2006.01); A61B 18/00 (2006.01); A61B 18/20 (2006.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/008 (2013.01); A61B 34/35 (2016.02); A61F 9/00804 (2013.01); A61B 2017/306 (2013.01); A61B 2018/2025 (2013.01); A61B 2090/3945 (2016.02); A61B 2218/005 (2013.01); A61F 2009/00872 (2013.01); A61F 2009/00882 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848746A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848746 A1 19981105; AU 735854 B2 20010719; AU 7528898 A 19981124; BR 9808977 A 20000801; CA 2287284 A1 19981105; CA 2287284 C 20100615; CN 1211055 C 20050720; CN 1253487 A 20000517; DE 69832289 D1 20051215; DE 69832289 T2 20060810; EP 1011563 A1 20000628; EP 1011563 B1 20051109; ES 2251082 T3 20060416; HK 1026359 A1 20060512; JP 2001522279 A 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-06-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TECHNOLAS PERFECT VISION GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TECHNOLAS GMBH OPHTHALMOLOGISCHE SYSTEME, 85622 FELDKIRCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 69832289

- Effective date: 20110415

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251082 T3

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69832289 P 20051215

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNOLAS GMBH OPHTHALMOLOGISCHE SYSTEME

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031126

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT