Global Patent Index - EP 1011608 A2

EP 1011608 A2 2000-06-28 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CARDIOPULMONARY AND RENAL FAILURE OR DAMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH ISCHEMIA, ENDOTOXIN RELEASE, ARDS OR BROUGHT ABOUT BY ADMINISTRATION OF CERTAIN DRUGS

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CARDIOPULMONARY AND RENAL FAILURE OR DAMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH ISCHEMIA, ENDOTOXIN RELEASE, ARDS OR BROUGHT ABOUT BY ADMINISTRATION OF CERTAIN DRUGS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND METHODE ZUR PRÄVENTION UND BEHANDLUNG VON HERZLUNGEN-UND NIERENVERSAGEN ODER SCHÄDEN DIE IM ZUSAMMENHANG STEHEN MIT ISCHÄMIE, ENDOTOXIN FREISETZUNG, ARDS ODER HERVORGERUFEN WERDEN DURCH DIE GABE BESTIMMTER MEDIKAMENTE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE POUR LA PREVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INSUFFISANCE CARDIO-PULMONAIRE ET RENALE, OU DES LESIONS CONSECUTIVES A L'ISCHEMIE, LA LIBERATION D'ENDOTOXINES, L'EMPHYSEME PULMONAIRE OU A L'ADMINISTRATION DE CERTAINS MEDICAMENTS

Publication

EP 1011608 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99930160 A

Priority

  • US 9912775 W
  • US 8850198 P
  • US 9397298 A
  • US 8865798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963938A2] A pharmaceutical composition comprises an agent such as an adenosine A2a agonist agent and/or nucleic acid comprising an oligonucleotide(oligo) that is anti-sense to an adenosine A1, A2a, A2b or A3 receptor gene, mRNA, flanking regions or regions bridging the intro/exon borders, which oligos are effective to prevent, alleviate or inhibit adenosine-mediated cardiac, pulmonary and/or renal functional difficulties, damage or failure, such as those observed in diseases and conditions such as ARDS, hypoxia, etc. or associated with the administration of therapeutic and diagnostic agents such as adenosine cysplatin, metal ion-containing agents, etc., mixtures thereof, and optionally a surfactant, a carrier and other therapeutic and diagnostic agents and other formulation components. The composition is provided in the form of various formulations that are, for example, effective for preventing or alleviating bronchoconstriction, allergy and/or inflammation associated with ARDS, RDS, etc., deleterious side effects observed upon treatment of SVT patients, upon administration of cardiac stress tests or imaging tests, etc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 6/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/7076 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C12N 15/1138 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01); C12N 2310/33 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3341 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963938 A2 19991216; WO 9963938 A3 20000127; WO 9963938 A9 20000302; AU 4675699 A 19991230; CA 2316994 A1 19991216; EP 1011608 A2 20000628; EP 1011608 A4 20020515

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027510

2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2002-05-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 48/00 A, 7C 07H 21/00 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 15/79 B, 7C 12N 15/09 B

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 48/00 A, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7C 07H 21/00 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 15/79 B, 7C 12N 15/09 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE