Global Patent Index - EP 1011611 A1

EP 1011611 A1 2000-06-28 - HAIR CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

HAIR CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

HAAR PFLEGENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS POUR LE CONDITIONNEMENT DES CHEVEUX

Publication

EP 1011611 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97940551 A

Priority

US 9714161 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911226A1] Disclosed are hair conditioning compositions comprising by weight: (a) from about 0.6 % to about 9.0 % of an amidoamine; (b) from about 0.1 % to about 10.0 % of an acid selected from the group consisting of acetic acid, tartaric acid, fumaric acid, lactic acid, malic acid, succinic acid, and mixtures thereof; (c) from about 1 % to about 15 % of a high melting point compound having a melting point of at least about 25 DEG C selected from the group consisting of fatty alcohols, fatty acids, fatty alcohol derivatives, fatty acid derivatives, hydrocarbons, steroids, and mixtures thereof; and (d) water; wherein the pH of the hair conditioning composition is between from about 2.5 to about 4.5, and wherein the composition is substantially free of quaternary ammonium compounds. Further disclosed are suitable methods of making the conditioning compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/31 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/362 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/64 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 5/12 (2013.01); A61K 8/362 (2013.01); A61K 8/365 (2013.01); A61K 8/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911226A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911226 A1 19990311; AU 4230297 A 19990322; EP 1011611 A1 20000628; JP 2000507976 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAMURA, HARUO

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAKAMURA, KIICHIRO

2003-02-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020803

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAMURA, HARUO

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAKAMURA, KIICHIRO

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE