Global Patent Index - EP 1011656 A2

EP 1011656 A2 2000-06-28 - A METHOD FOR TREATING TENSION-TYPE HEADACHE

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR TREATING TENSION-TYPE HEADACHE

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANSPANNUNGSBEDINGTEN KOPFSCHMERZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE CEPHALEES DU TYPE PAR TENSION NERVEUSE

Publication

EP 1011656 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97911150 A

Priority

  • DK 9700502 W
  • DK 124396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819674A2] Tension-type headache is treated by interacting with neuronal transmission in relation to pain in connection with headache in a way which prevents or decreases sensitization of second order nociceptive neurons. In particular, treatment is performed by administration of an effective amount of a substance which prevents or decreases central sensitization. Important examples of such substances are substances which interact with glutamate neurotransmission, such as glutamate receptor antagonists, such as NMDA receptor antagonists, such as MK-801 or Amitriptylline or Imipramine or Desipramine or Mirtazaprine or Venlafaxine. Other examples are substances which interact with nitric oxide, such as nitric oxide synthase (NOS) inhibitors, such as L-NMMA or L-NAME or L-NIO or L-NNA. According to a broader aspect of the invention tension-type headache is treated by administration of substances which are effective in preventing or decreasing pain in connection with tension-type headache, such as the substances mentioned above. An additional aspect of the invention relates to treatment of tension-type headache by administration of substances which substantially inhibit the activity of nitric oxide synthase (NOS), such as NOS inhibitors, such as L-NMMA or L-NAME or L-NIO or L-NNA.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/195; A61K 31/485; A61K 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/195 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/13 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/138 (2006.01); A61K 31/155 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/167 (2006.01); A61K 31/196 (2006.01); A61K 31/197 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/223 (2006.01); A61K 31/27 (2006.01); A61K 31/33 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/4015 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/407 (2006.01); A61K 31/416 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/4166 (2006.01); A61K 31/4168 (2006.01); A61K 31/4174 (2006.01); A61K 31/42 (2006.01); A61K 31/428 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/439 (2006.01); A61K 31/4409 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/4465 (2006.01); A61K 31/451 (2006.01); A61K 31/4525 (2006.01); A61K 31/4535 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/455 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/4704 (2006.01); A61K 31/4725 (2006.01); A61K 31/485 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/498 (2006.01); A61K 31/4985 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 31/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/54 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61K 31/5517 (2006.01); A61K 31/58 (2006.01); A61K 31/66 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 35/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/05 (2006.01); A61K 38/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/08 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/13 (2013.01); A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 31/138 (2013.01); A61K 31/155 (2013.01); A61K 31/165 (2013.01); A61K 31/167 (2013.01); A61K 31/195 (2013.01); A61K 31/196 (2013.01); A61K 31/197 (2013.01); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 31/223 (2013.01); A61K 31/27 (2013.01); A61K 31/33 (2013.01); A61K 31/4015 (2013.01); A61K 31/404 (2013.01); A61K 31/407 (2013.01); A61K 31/416 (2013.01); A61K 31/4164 (2013.01); A61K 31/4166 (2013.01); A61K 31/4168 (2013.01); A61K 31/4174 (2013.01); A61K 31/42 (2013.01); A61K 31/428 (2013.01); A61K 31/437 (2013.01); A61K 31/439 (2013.01); A61K 31/4409 (2013.01); A61K 31/445 (2013.01); A61K 31/4465 (2013.01); A61K 31/451 (2013.01); A61K 31/4525 (2013.01); A61K 31/4535 (2013.01); A61K 31/454 (2013.01); A61K 31/4545 (2013.01); A61K 31/455 (2013.01); A61K 31/47 (2013.01); A61K 31/4704 (2013.01); A61K 31/4725 (2013.01); A61K 31/485 (2013.01); A61K 31/495 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01); A61K 31/498 (2013.01); A61K 31/4985 (2013.01); A61K 31/519 (2013.01); A61K 31/522 (2013.01); A61K 31/53 (2013.01); A61K 31/54 (2013.01); A61K 31/55 (2013.01); A61K 31/551 (2013.01); A61K 31/5517 (2013.01); A61K 31/58 (2013.01); A61K 31/66 (2013.01); A61K 31/662 (2013.01); A61K 31/675 (2013.01); A61K 31/7076 (2013.01); A61K 38/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9819674A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819674 A2 19980514; WO 9819674 A3 19980716; AU 4863297 A 19980529; AU 734490 B2 20010614; CA 2270531 A1 19980514; CA 2270531 C 20110830; EP 1011656 A2 20000628; EP 1132082 A1 20010912; EP 1829539 A2 20070905; EP 1829539 A3 20080220

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070724

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/195 20060101AFI20070514BHEP

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/485 20060101ALI20070514BHEP

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 35/00 20060101ALI20070514BHEP

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEADEXPLORER APS

2003-02-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEAD EXPLORER A/S

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEAD EXPLORER APS

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990607;LT PAYMENT 19990607;LV PAYMENT 19990607;MK PAYMENT 19990607;RO PAYMENT 19990607;SI PAYMENT 19990607