Global Patent Index - EP 1011662 A1

EP 1011662 A1 2000-06-28 - IMPROVED COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE CONTROL OF SMOKING

Title (en)

IMPROVED COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE CONTROL OF SMOKING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR TYPISIERUNG VON HLA KLASS-I DNS

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES AMELIOREES POUR LA LUTTE CONTRE LE TABAGISME

Publication

EP 1011662 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939992 A

Priority

  • AU 9800711 W
  • AU PO897997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911257A1] Compositions for the control of smoking are disclosed, the compositions comprising: (a) a xanthine oxidase inhibitor; (b) a phosphate or a compound capable of releasing phosphate on administration to a subject; and optionally (c) a sugar; and still further optionally (d) one or more pharmaceutically acceptable carriers or excipients. There are also described methods for the control of smoking which comprises administering to a subject in need of such treatment the aforementioned composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/35; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/505; A61K 31/52; A61K 31/53; A61K 31/70; A61K 33/42; A61K 35/78; A61K 31/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/34 (2006.01); A61K 31/35 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 31/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/66 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7004 (2006.01); A61K 33/42 (2006.01); A61K 36/00 (2006.01); A61K 36/18 (2006.01); A61K 36/28 (2006.01); A61K 47/02 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 25/26 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 25/34 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 33/42 (2013.01); A61K 36/28 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 33/42 + A61K 31/70
  2. A61K 33/42 + A61K 31/53
  3. A61K 33/42 + A61K 31/52
  4. A61K 33/42 + A61K 31/505
  5. A61K 33/42 + A61K 31/35
  6. A61K 33/42 + A61K 31/34
  7. A61K 33/42 + A61K 2300/00
  8. A61K 36/28 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911257 A1 19990311; AU PO897997 D0 19970925; CA 2302248 A1 19990311; EP 1011662 A1 20000628; EP 1011662 A4 20020821; JP 2001514220 A 20010911; JP 2004231662 A 20040819; JP 3615704 B2 20050202; NZ 503559 A 20021220

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029744

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-08-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000314;LT PAYMENT 20000314;LV PAYMENT 20000314;MK PAYMENT 20000314;RO PAYMENT 20000314;SI PAYMENT 20000314