Global Patent Index - EP 1011681 A1

EP 1011681 A1 2000-06-28 - ORAL CONTRACEPTIVE PREPARATION HAVING A FIRST PHASE COMPRISING PROGESTIN/ESTROGEN AND A SECOND PHASE COMPRISING PROGESTIN

Title (en)

ORAL CONTRACEPTIVE PREPARATION HAVING A FIRST PHASE COMPRISING PROGESTIN/ESTROGEN AND A SECOND PHASE COMPRISING PROGESTIN

Title (de)

ORALE KONTRAZEPTIVE ZUBEREITUNG ENTHALTEND EINE ERSTE PHASE ENTHALTENDE EINE KOMBINATION VON GESTAGEN/ESTROGEN UND EINE ZWEITE PHASE ENTHALTEND GESTAGEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION CONTRACEPTIVE ORALE COMPORTANT UNE PREMIERE PHASE A BASE DE PROGESTINE/OESTROGENE ET UNE SECONDE PHASE A BASE DE PROGESTINE

Publication

EP 1011681 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944837 A

Priority

  • US 9818850 W
  • US 92853097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913882A1] This invention provides a method of contraception which comprises administering to a female of child bearing age for 28 days per menstrual cycle a combination of a progestin at a daily dosage equivalent to 30-150 mu g levornorgestrel and an estrogen at a daily dosage equivalent to 10-20 mu g ethinyl estradiol for 23-25 days beginning on day 1 of the menstrual cycle, followed by administering a progestin at a daily dosage equivalent to 10-100 mu g levornorgestrel for 3-5 days.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/565 (2006.01); A61K 31/57 (2006.01); A61P 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/565 (2013.01); A61K 31/567 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/565 + A61K 31/565
  2. A61K 31/565 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913882A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913882 A1 19990325; AU 759925 B2 20030501; AU 9228698 A 19990405; CA 2301162 A1 19990325; CN 1270521 A 20001018; EP 1011681 A1 20000628; JP 2001516720 A 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028345

2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/56 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 15/18 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/56 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 15/18 B

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011008

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000124;LT PAYMENT 20000124;LV PAYMENT 20000124;MK PAYMENT 20000124;RO PAYMENT 20000124;SI PAYMENT 20000124