Global Patent Index - EP 1011709 A4

EP 1011709 A4 2003-06-18 - INHIBITION OF APOPTOTIS USING PROSAPOSIN RECEPTOR AGONISTS

Title (en)

INHIBITION OF APOPTOTIS USING PROSAPOSIN RECEPTOR AGONISTS

Title (de)

APOPTOSEHEMMUNG DURCH PROSAPOSIN REZEPTORAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

INHIBITION DE L'APOPTOSE AU MOYEN D'AGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE LA PROSAPOSINE

Publication

EP 1011709 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98951917 A

Priority

  • US 9819216 W
  • US 5835297 P
  • US 8812998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912559A1] A method for inhibiting caspase-mediated apoptosis by administering prosaposin receptor agonists is provided. Apoptosis has a major causative role in diseases such as rheumatoid arthritis, irritable bowel syndrome, congestive heart failure, multiple sclerosis, Alzheimer's disease, Parkinson's disease, myocardial infraction, and coronary ischemia.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/04; A61K 38/10; A61K 38/16; A61K 38/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/14 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/18 (2013.01); Y02A 50/411 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 5571787 A 19961105 - O'BRIEN JOHN S [US], et al
  • [X] HIRAIWA ET AL: "CELL DEATH PREVENTION, MITOGEN-ACTIVATED PROTEIN KINASE STIMULATION, AND INCREASED SULFATIDE CONCENTRATIONS IN SCHWANN CELLS AND OLIGODENDROCYTES BY PROSAPOSIN AND PROSAPTIDES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 94, April 1997 (1997-04-01), pages 4778 - 4781, XP002135051, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [XY] HOZUMI I ET AL: "Amelioration of spatial learning impairment and neuronal loss in rats with stab wounds by prosaposin.", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, vol. 69, no. SUPPL., 1997, Joint Sixteenth Biennial Meeting of the International Society for Neurochemistry and Twenty-eighth Annual Meeting of the American Society for Neurochemistry;Boston, Massachusetts, USA; July 20-26, 199, pages S249, XP009008631, ISSN: 0022-3042
  • [YA] CAMPANA W M ET AL: "Prosaptide, a peptide derived from prosaposin, induces motor endplate sprouting and prevents taxol neuropathy.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 21, no. 1-3, 1995, 25th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience;San Diego, California, USA; November 11-16, 1995, pages 554, XP009008629, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • [XP] TAYLOR E M ET AL: "Prosaposin and prosaptide prevent TNF-alpha-induced cell death in NS20Y and CG4 cells.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 23, no. 1-2, 1997, 27th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; October 25-30, 1997, pages 2226, XP009008626, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • [XP] TSUBOI K ET AL: "Prosaposin and prosaptide can prevent programmed cell death of rat cerebellar granule neurons.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 23, no. 1-2, 1997, 27th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; October 25-30, 1997, pages 1439, XP009008627, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • [XP] TSUBOI K ET AL: "PROSAPOSIN PREVENTS PROGRAMMED CELL DEATH OF RAT CEREBELLAR GRANULENEURONS IN CULTURE", DEVELOPMENTAL BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 110, no. 2, 1998, pages 249 - 255, XP000915816, ISSN: 0165-3806
  • [PX] WAGNER ROCHELLE ET AL: "Prosaptide prevents hyperalgesia and reduces peripheral TNFR1 expression following TNF-alpha nerve injection.", NEUROREPORT, vol. 9, no. 12, 24 August 1998 (1998-08-24), pages 2827 - 2831, XP009008642, ISSN: 0959-4965
  • [T] OTERO DEBORAH A C ET AL: "Reversal of thermal hyperalgesia in a rat partial sciatic nerve ligation model by Prosaptide(R) TX14(A).", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, vol. 270, no. 1, 23 July 1999 (1999-07-23), pages 29 - 32, XP002238179, ISSN: 0304-3940
  • [T] YAN LIZHEN ET AL: "ProsaptideTM D5 reverses hyperalgesia: Inhibition of calcium channels through a pertussis toxin-sensitive G-protein mechanism in the rat.", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, vol. 278, no. 1-2, 7 January 2000 (2000-01-07), pages 120 - 122, XP002238180, ISSN: 0304-3940
  • [T] YAN L ET AL: "A 14-mer prosaptide activates a G-protein receptor and diminishes calcium flux in synaptosomes.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 24, no. 1-2, 1998, 28th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience, Part 1;Los Angeles, California, USA; November 7-12, 1998, pages 805, XP009009360, ISSN: 0190-5295
  • See also references of WO 9912559A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912559 A1 19990318; AU 9774698 A 19990329; CA 2304108 A1 19990318; EP 1011709 A1 20000628; EP 1011709 A4 20030618; JP 2001515866 A 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE