Global Patent Index - EP 1011736 A2

EP 1011736 A2 2000-06-28 - POLYMERS

Title (en)

POLYMERS

Title (de)

POLYMERE

Title (fr)

POLYMERES

Publication

EP 1011736 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98902085 A

Priority

  • GB 9800270 W
  • GB 9701813 A
  • US 5707497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832469A2] The invention provides compounds comprising a linear, branched or dendrimeric polymer backbone with linked thereto at least one reporter moiety, said polymer backbone comprising a plurality of amine-containing acids. Such compounds may be linked to one or more targeting agents and are useful as therapeutic and diagnostic agents, in particular in medical imaging techniques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 49/04; A61K 49/00; C07K 1/04; C07K 5/02; C07K 7/02; C07K 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/04 (2006.01); A61K 49/08 (2006.01); C07K 5/02 (2006.01); C07K 7/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/124 (2013.01); A61K 49/0442 (2013.01); A61K 49/085 (2013.01); C07K 7/02 (2013.01); C07K 14/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9832469A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832469 A2 19980730; WO 9832469 A3 19981105; AU 5871798 A 19980818; CA 2278200 A1 19980730; CN 1246059 A 20000301; EP 1011736 A2 20000628; JP 2001509796 A 20010724; KR 20000070544 A 20001125; NO 993662 A 19990928; NO 993662 D0 19990728

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMERSHAM HEALTH AS

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NYCOMED IMAGING AS

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990715

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT SE