Global Patent Index - EP 1011823 A1

EP 1011823 A1 2000-06-28 - ROLLER SKATE WITH REINFORCING LEGGINGS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR BRAKING

Title (en)

ROLLER SKATE WITH REINFORCING LEGGINGS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR BRAKING

Title (de)

ROLLSCHUHE MIT BEINBÜGEL FÜR VERSTÄRKUNG BESONDERS FÜR BREMSEN

Title (fr)

PATIN A ROULETTES AVEC JAMBIERE DE RENFORT ET NOTAMMENT DE FREINAGE

Publication

EP 1011823 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97910496 A

Priority

  • FR 9701852 W
  • FR 9613085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2754461A1] The sport gear, in particular a roller skate, is to be fixed under the sole (18) of a walking shoe (19) comprising towards the front and the back orifices (20, 21) providing access to reinforcement catching zones. It is provided with catching means, projecting beyond a sole supporting plate (3) and capable of being engaged, when being mounted on the sole, into said orifices (20, 21) and an actuating system for moving at least one mobile catching element for fixing the gear to the sole. The catching elements(s) (5), by the operation of the actuating system, has or have a two-phase displacement, viz. a horizontal phase for placing the element (5) above the reinforced catching zone and a vertical phase for blocking it into position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/14 (2006.01); A63C 17/18 (2006.01); A63C 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/06 (2013.01); A63C 17/1427 (2013.01); A63C 17/1445 (2013.01); A63C 17/20 (2013.01); A63C 17/262 (2013.01); A63C 2203/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9816280A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2754461 A1 19980417; FR 2754461 B1 19990212; DE 69720547 D1 20030508; EP 0932434 A1 19990804; EP 1011823 A1 20000628; EP 1011823 B1 20030402; WO 9816280 A1 19980423; WO 9816283 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2005-10-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051016

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69720547 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL

2003-04-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990326

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL