Global Patent Index - EP 1011837 A2

EP 1011837 A2 2000-06-28 - DEVICE FOR FACILITATING MANICURING AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FACILITATING MANICURING AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER MANIKüRE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DESSEN GEBRAUCH

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF FACILITANT LA MANUCURE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DUDIT DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1011837 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97937676 A

Priority

  • GB 9702229 W
  • ZM 2696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2316315A] A portable finger location and support device for use during manicuring comprises an elongate triangular section body 1 bearing a series of recesses 2-5 extending from a common edge into the two adjacent sides (see also Fig 1) for receiving the fingers of a left or right hand gripping the device. An additional recess 1 is provided at one end for the thumb. A nail file 6 may be provided at the other end and a sharpener for cosmetic pencils may be built in.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 29/18 (2006.01); A45D 29/22 (2006.01); B43L 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 29/22 (2013.01); A45D 29/18 (2013.01); B43L 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9807347A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2316315 A8 19980223; GB 2316315 A 19980225; GB 9717641 D0 19971022; AT 265258 T 20040515; DE 69728910 D1 20040603; DE 69728910 T2 20050331; EP 1011837 A2 20000628; EP 1011837 B1 20040428; ES 2221063 T3 20041216; WO 9807347 A2 19980226; WO 9807347 A3 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051126

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051125

2006-07-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2005-11-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2005-11-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051125

2005-11-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051125

2005-11-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051125

2005-05-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221063 T3

2004-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69728910 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE