Global patent index - EP 1011867 A1

EP 1011867 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CENTRIFUGING VISCOUS FLUIDS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CENTRIFUGING VISCOUS FLUIDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZENTRIFUGIEREN VON VISKOSEN FLUIDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CENTRIFUGER DES FLUIDES VISQUEUX

Publication

EP 1011867 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952584 A

Priority

  • DE 19738128 A
  • EP 9805541 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19738128A1] The invention relates to devices for centrifuging viscous liquids, especially viscous plastic melts, and to a shearing device in addition to a method for shearing viscous fluids, especially viscous plastic melts, wherein the viscosity of the fluid is reduced considerably by mechanical force before the centrifugal stage in a shearing device (30) in order to provide economical centrifuging of viscous fluids. In order to reduce viscosity, the fluid is subjected to a shearing force between a rotating inner part (31) and a stationary outer part (32) in a shearing channel (33) inside the shearing device (30) so that the impurities in the high viscous fluid can be eliminated in the centrifuging stage (54) in an economical manner. The impurities of the fluid in the centrifuging stage (54) are eliminated from the centrifuging device by means of a conveyor worm (51) using centrifugal force in a direction opposite to the flow of the cleaned fluid along the outer covering of the centrifuge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 1/20; B04B 11/06; B04B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2006.01); B04B 11/06 (2006.01); B04B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 11/06 (2013.01); B04B 1/20 (2013.01); B04B 15/00 (2013.01); B04B 2001/2033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911379A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738128 A1 19990311; AU 1022899 A 19990322; EP 1011867 A1 20000628; EP 1011867 B1 20010620; WO 9911379 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-06-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800897

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-26

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-12-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR CENTRIFUGING VISCOUS FLUIDS

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE