Global Patent Index - EP 1011868 A1

EP 1011868 A1 2000-06-28 - ROTOR, ESPECIALLY FOR INCORPORATION INTO THE ENCLOSURE OF A FREE JET CENTRIFUGE

Title (en)

ROTOR, ESPECIALLY FOR INCORPORATION INTO THE ENCLOSURE OF A FREE JET CENTRIFUGE

Title (de)

ROTOR, INSBESONDERE ZUM EINBAU IN DAS GEHÄUSE EINER FREISTRAHLZENTRIFUGE

Title (fr)

ROTOR, A INCORPORER NOTAMMENT DANS LE CARTER D'UNE CENTRIFUGEUSE A JET LIBRE

Publication

EP 1011868 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919273 A

Priority

  • DE 19715661 A
  • EP 9802219 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846361A1] Disclosed is a rotor (1) designed to be incorporated into the enclosure (16) of a free jet centrifuge. At least the rotor head (11) is of plastic. Grooves, preferably radial, are provided inside the rotor for reinforcing same and facilitate the supply of centrifugation liquid. Owing to its form, the plastic centrifuge rotor (11) can be comprised of a reduced number of parts. The rotor may consist of two elements, either locked or welded. The oil centrifuge fitted with such a rotor is particularly suitable for cleaning lubricating oil used in internal combustion engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 7/08 (2006.01); B04B 5/00 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 5/005 (2013.01); F01M 2001/1035 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0422 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846361A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846361 A1 19981022; BR 9808600 A 20020122; CA 2310023 A1 19981022; CA 2310023 C 20070828; CZ 295084 B6 20050518; CZ 9903665 A3 20001213; DE 19715661 A1 19981022; EP 1011868 A1 20000628; EP 1011868 B1 20020327; ES 2175704 T3 20021116; JP 2001518839 A 20011016; US 6224531 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175704 T3

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803548 20020502

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE