Global Patent Index - EP 1011875 A1

EP 1011875 A1 2000-06-28 - MASKING TAPES AND APPLICATION METHODS

Title (en)

MASKING TAPES AND APPLICATION METHODS

Title (de)

ABDECKBÄNDER UND DEREN ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

RUBANS ADHESIFS DE CARROSSIER ET TECHNIQUES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1011875 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942854 A

Priority

  • GB 9802706 W
  • GB 9719091 A
  • GB 9726724 A
  • GB 9805059 A
  • GB 9814477 A
  • US 52325200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912654A2] There is disclosed a masking foam tape adapted for use in spraying automobile doors and like openings to prevent penetration of spray through the unsealed gap between door and door surround, having an elongate substantially rectangular section having major dimension at least twice but not more than four times its minor dimension and having at one end of its elongate section adhesive for attachment at the opening and being tapered and free of adhesive at the other end thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); C09J 7/02 (2006.01); C09J 201/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/0468 (2013.01); B05B 15/0456 (2013.01); B05B 15/0462 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912654A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912654 A2 19990318; WO 9912654 A3 20030724; AU 9083198 A 19990329; EP 1011875 A1 20000628; GB 0001389 D0 20000308; GB 2342601 A 20000419; GB 2342601 B 20000927; JP 2003527229 A 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040306

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-09-10 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JEVONS, OLIVER

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JEVONS, OLIVER

2001-01-25 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2000-09-22 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE