Global patent index - EP 1011897 A1

EP 1011897 A1 2000-06-28 - SEMI-SOLID METAL FORMING PROCESS

Title (en)

SEMI-SOLID METAL FORMING PROCESS

Title (de)

METALLFORMUNGSVERFAHREN MIT HALBFESTEM MATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FORMER UN METAL SEMI-SOLIDE

Publication

EP 1011897 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98901901 A

Priority

  • CA 9800062 W
  • CA 2196479 A
  • CA 2227828 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9833610A1] A semi-solid metal forming process using a cast billet and having the following steps: 1) heating the cast billet to a temperature above its recrystallization temperature and below its solidus temperature; 2) extruding the cast billet into an extruded column; 3) cutting the extruded column into at least one billet; 4) heating the billet from step 3 to a semi-solid state; and 5) squeezing the billet from step 4 into a cavity in a metal forming die set to form a part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/00; B21C 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/00 (2006.01); B21J 1/06 (2006.01); B21J 5/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 18/02 (2006.01); C22C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/02 (2013.01); B21C 23/00 (2013.01); B21J 5/00 (2013.01); B21J 5/004 (2013.01); C22C 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9833610A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9833610 A1 19980806; AU 5850098 A 19980825; CA 2227828 A1 19980731; CA 2227828 C 20021112; DE 69818282 D1 20031023; EP 1011897 A1 20000628; EP 1011897 B1 20030917; JP 2001509085 A 20010710

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-12-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031228

2003-12-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-12-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69818282

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-09-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE