Global Patent Index - EP 1011919 A4

EP 1011919 A4 2000-11-02 - IMPROVED POLISHING PADS AND METHODS RELATING THERETO

Title (en)

IMPROVED POLISHING PADS AND METHODS RELATING THERETO

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE POLIERKISSEN UND DARAUF BEZOGENE VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

TAMPONS DE POLISSAGE PERFECTIONNES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1011919 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98938386 A

Priority

  • US 9816289 W
  • US 5490697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907515A1] Polishing pads are provided having a polishing surface formed from a hydrophilic material. The polishing surface has a topography produced by a thermoforming process. The topography consists of large and small features that facilitate the flow of polishing fluid and facilitate smoothing and planarizing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 1/00; B24B 7/19; B24B 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/24 (2012.01); B24D 3/26 (2006.01); B24D 13/12 (2006.01); B24D 13/14 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/24 (2013.01); B24D 3/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907515 A1 19990218; CN 1265618 A 20000906; DE 69827147 D1 20041125; DE 69827147 T2 20060302; EP 1011919 A1 20000628; EP 1011919 A4 20001102; EP 1011919 B1 20041020; JP 2001513450 A 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160802

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2004-12-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROHM AND HAAS ELECTRONIC MATERIALS CMP HOLDINGS, I

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69827147 P 20041125

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A POLISHING PAD

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030114

2000-11-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT