Global patent index - EP 1011937 A1

EP 1011937 A1 2000-06-28 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING ANY WIDTH OF WOOD OR OTHER MATERIALS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CUTTING ANY WIDTH OF WOOD OR OTHER MATERIALS

Title (de)

ZUSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR HOLZ ODER ANDERE MATERIALIEN AUF BELIEBIGE BREITE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUPE EN LARGEUR DESTINE AU BOIS ET AUTRES MATERIAUX

Publication

EP 1011937 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919072 A

Priority

  • DE 9800853 W
  • DE 29705755 U
  • DE 29708539 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6393956B1] A device for cutting wood or other materials comprises a saw blade clamping device for radially and/or axially fixing circular saw blades mounted axially displaceable on a drive shaft. Support bodies are provided axially displaceable on the drive shaft for each circular saw blade. The axial displacement of the circular saw blades takes place by guide spindles running parallel to the axis of the drive shaft and passing through the support bodies. At least one clamping element is mounted in the drive shaft 1, 20. The clamping element is mounted radially displaceable. In a first stage, the circular saw blades which are mounted on the support bodies are thereby displaced. In a second stage, the circular saw blades or support bodies are connected to the drive shaft in keyed and/or force locking engagement. Through the device, a displacement of the cutting width is possible without the time and labor intensive dismantling of the saw blades. The support bodies for the circular saw blades are narrower than the known displacement heads for multi-blade circular saws. A larger number of circular saw blades can thereby be fitted on one axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 5/34; B27B 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 5/32 (2006.01); B27B 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 5/34 (2013.01); Y10T 83/659 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7822 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7826 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7876 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9471 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841369A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6393956 B1 20020528; AT 220974 T 20020815; CA 2283700 A1 19980924; DK 1011937 T3 20021111; EP 1011937 A1 20000628; EP 1011937 B1 20020724; ES 2183352 T3 20030316; JP 2001515418 A 20010918; PT 1011937 E 20021231; US RE40349 E 20080603; WO 9841369 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080317

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080316

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080916

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080916

2007-03-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-07 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070307

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-04-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: RAIMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-03-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: RAIMANN HOLZOPTIMIERUNG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2003-09-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Free Format Text: RAIMANN HOLZOPTIMIERUNG GMBH & CO. KG DE

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: RAIMANN HOLZOPTIMIERUNG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2183352

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RAIMANN HOLZOPTIMIERUNG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-01-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RAIMANN HOLZOPTIMIERUNG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-11-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804917

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-29

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 220974

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010925

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990821

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE